Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2021 at 04:05:16 (UTC).

CHERISE SHEFFIELD VS G6 HOSPITALITY, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 CHERISE SHEFFIELD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against G6 HOSPITALITY, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1474

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHEFFIELD CHERISE

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

PATEL HITESH

G6 HOSPITALITY LLC

MOTEL 6

PATEL MADHUBHAI

PATEL LAXMIBEN

Cross Defendant

FOES 1 THROUGH 25 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITCHELL TIMOTHY PAUL

Defendant Attorney

SOUZA JAMES P

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/2/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer

4/19/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/19/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/1/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/1/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/16/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

2/26/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

2/26/2021: Cross-Complaint

Objection - OBJECTION MOTEL 6 OF GARDENA, CA#8940; AND HITESH PATELS JELD-WEN, INC. V. SUPERIOR COURT OBJECTION

2/26/2021: Objection - OBJECTION MOTEL 6 OF GARDENA, CA#8940; AND HITESH PATELS JELD-WEN, INC. V. SUPERIOR COURT OBJECTION

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/25/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/14/2021: Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2024
  • Hearing01/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • Hearing07/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Hearing06/30/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Madhubhai Patel (Defendant); Laxmiben Patel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Madhubhai Patel (Defendant); Laxmiben Patel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cherise Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Cherise Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Cherise Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Cherise Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Cherise Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cherise Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Cherise Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cherise Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cherise Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cherise Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cherise Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Cherise Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G6 HOSPITALITY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOUZA, JAMES P