This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 22:55:39 (UTC).

CHERISE AUSTIN VS JOSHUA DUMAS

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 CHERISE AUSTIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSHUA DUMAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0695

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUSTIN CHERISE

Defendant

DUMAS JOSHUA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAYSBERG ALLEN PAUL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/26/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal

11/3/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cherise Austin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Cherise Austin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cherise Austin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cherise Austin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cherise Austin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAYSBERG ALLEN PAUL