Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2021 at 01:13:05 (UTC).

CHENG, MEI SHIANG - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 CHENG, MEI SHIANG - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1441

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

YANG CHUN TING

Decedent

CHENG MEI SHIANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Decedent Attorney

RYAN GREGORY ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Status Report of Personal Representative

3/5/2021: Status Report of Personal Representative

Minute Order

3/23/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/5/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/16/2020: Minute Order

Letters (Initial) - Administrator with Full Authority

6/26/2019: Letters (Initial) - Administrator with Full Authority

Bond - The Hartford

6/26/2019: Bond - The Hartford

Bond

4/24/2019: Bond

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - DUTIES AND LIABILITIES

4/25/2019: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - DUTIES AND LIABILITIES

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

5/17/2019: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

5/21/2019: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

2/14/2019: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

2/19/2019: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

3/5/2019: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Minute Order

3/18/2019: Minute Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • Hearing07/23/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Report Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketStatus Report of Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 99, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketLetters (Initial) (Administrator with Full Authority ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketBond (The Hartford ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities (CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENT TO DUTIES AND LIABILITIES ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketBond; Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 99, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial) filed on February 14, 2019 by Chun Ting Yang. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN GREGORY R.