Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 03:56:12 (UTC).

CHEN, XIAOTONG VS CHEN, MICHAEL M.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 CHEN, XIAOTONG filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHEN, MICHAEL M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0203

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHEN XIAOTONG

Respondent

CHEN MICHAEL M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHOOK MICHAEL DITTRICH

 

Court Documents

Petition - Amended (1st)

3/15/2021: Petition - Amended (1st)

FL_General Family Law - Summons - Amended

3/17/2021: FL_General Family Law - Summons - Amended

Summons

2/23/2021: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

2/23/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/23/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

2/24/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

2/24/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons - Amended; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPetition - Amended (1st); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHOOK MICHAEL DITTRICH