This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/02/2022 at 22:50:31 (UTC).

CHEN, STACY VS BROGDEN, CHRISTINA

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 CHEN, STACY filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against BROGDEN, CHRISTINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTELLA, TIMOTHY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0681

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARTELLA, TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHEN STACY

Respondent

BROGDEN CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GROSS KENNETH I.

 

Court Documents

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

7/16/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

7/16/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

7/15/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

Minute Order

11/19/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Notice

11/15/2021: Notice - Notice

Declaration

9/3/2021: Declaration

Notice - Motion - and Motion for Attorney fees and costs in the amount of $4046.75; Memorandum of points and authorities

9/3/2021: Notice - Motion - and Motion for Attorney fees and costs in the amount of $4046.75; Memorandum of points and authorities

Minute Order

8/10/2021: Minute Order

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

8/10/2021: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Proof of Service

7/20/2021: Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S, Martella, Timothy, Presiding; Motion Hearing - Off Calendar - Moving Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice - Motion (and Motion for Attorney fees and costs in the amount of $4046.75; Memorandum of points and authorities ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S, Martella, Timothy, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment (non-violence); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROSS KENNETH I. ESQ.