This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2022 at 17:39:05 (UTC).

CHEN, SHANGYE PICHETRUNGSI VS PICHETRUNGSI, JUSTIN RICK

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 CHEN, SHANGYE PICHETRUNGSI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PICHETRUNGSI, JUSTIN RICK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2143

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHEN SHANGYE PICHETRUNGSI

Respondent

PICHETRUNGSI JUSTIN RICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

O'YOUNG MICHAEL C

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

3/2/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Summons - Summons

2/25/2022: Summons - Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

2/25/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/25/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less