This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2021 at 05:26:07 (UTC).

CHELSEA CHARLES VS M. LEONARD & ASSOCIATES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 CHELSEA CHARLES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against M LEONARD ASSOCIATES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2554

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARLES CHELSEA

Defendants

M. LEONARD & ASSOCIATES

VCA ANIMAL HOSPITALS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARDONA-LOYA II OCTAVIO

Defendant Attorneys

FLYNN SEAN

HORN STEVEN JEFFRY

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

11/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/4/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/6/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

10/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF ANY UNSERVED DEFENDANTS ...)

9/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF ANY UNSERVED DEFENDANTS ...)

Answer

9/10/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

8/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

8/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

8/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

7/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/7/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Mail

7/7/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

7/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

6/24/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR M. LEONARD & ASSOCIATES

6/24/2021: Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR M. LEONARD & ASSOCIATES

Answer

6/8/2021: Answer

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • Hearing02/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Hearing01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Hearing05/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by M. Leonard & Associates (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by VCA Animal Hospitals, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by M. Leonard & Associates (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketApplication for Publication; Filed by Chelsea Charles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by VCA Animal Hospitals, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Chelsea Charles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Chelsea Charles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Chelsea Charles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Chelsea Charles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Chelsea Charles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M LEONARD & ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where VCA ANIMAL HOSPITALS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA VCA TLC PASADENA VETERINARY SPECIALTY AND EMERGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLYNN SEAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HORN STEVEN J.