This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2017 at 11:25:05 (UTC).

CHELI DISTRIBUTION CENTER INC VS JAD INTERNATIONAL

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 CHELI DISTRIBUTION CENTER INC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against JAD INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0415

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CHELI DISTRIBUTION CENTER INC.

Defendants and Respondents

JAD INTERNATIONAL

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DAVID M. COHEN APLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT?UNLAWFUL DETAINER

6/13/2017: JUDGMENT?UNLAWFUL DETAINER

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/18/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/26/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/23/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

5/5/2017: SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/13/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

9/19/2017: Minute Order

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

5/5/2017: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

APPLICATION OR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION, POSSESSION OR SALE

6/13/2017: APPLICATION OR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION, POSSESSION OR SALE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Writ issued (ISSUED-POSSESSION ONLY-LA COUNTY- ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB; AMERICAN LEGAL ) Filed by Attorney for Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (AS TO DOE DEFTS ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Appl for Writ of Possession (C&D) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Partial Judgment (not entire case) (FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Default Entered (JAD INTERNATIONAL, A NEW YORK CORPORATION AND UNNAMED TENANTS ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons (ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 415.46 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less