This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2019 at 08:52:25 (UTC).

CHEEMA FREIGHTLINES LLC., VS VEGWEST FARMS LLC.,

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 CHEEMA FREIGHTLINES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VEGWEST FARMS LLC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0525

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHEEMA FREIGHTLINES LLC.

Defendant

VEGWEST FARMS LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RUDY JR. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/9/2018: Complaint

Summons

8/9/2018: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/9/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment

8/9/2018: Notice of Case Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/15/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

10/3/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Request for Dismissal

11/29/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/30/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Unknown

12/13/2018: Unknown

Declaration

12/13/2018: Declaration

Declaration

12/13/2018: Declaration

Declaration

12/13/2018: Declaration

Order

12/13/2018: Order

Brief

12/13/2018: Brief

Minute Order

12/13/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/27/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

10/4/2018: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Declaration

9/5/2018: Declaration

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Declaration (Of Rodolfo Gaba, Jr., In Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest); Filed by Cheema Freightlines LLC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Order (Ruling on the Court's Tentative); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Judgment (- Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 12/13/2018 entered for Plaintiff Cheema Freightlines LLC., against Defendant Vegwest Farms LLC.,.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Declaration (In Lieu Of Testimony In Support of Request For Entry of Default Judgment, Pursuant To CCP Section 585(d)); Filed by Cheema Freightlines LLC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Brief (Plaintiff's Default Prove-Up Brief); Filed by Cheema Freightlines LLC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Declaration (of Rodolfo Gaba, Jr., In Support of Request For Attorney's Fees Pursuant To civil Code Section 1717.5); Filed by Cheema Freightlines LLC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Cheema Freightlines LLC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Cheema Freightlines LLC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Cheema Freightlines LLC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cheema Freightlines, LLC, a California limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABA JR. RUDY