Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2020 at 05:49:06 (UTC).

CHECK, JOHN VS NG, WINNIE WAI-LAN

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 CHECK, JOHN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NG, WINNIE WAI-LAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3808

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHECK JOHN

Respondent

NG WINNIE WAI-LAN

 

Court Documents

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

4/29/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

4/29/2020: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

4/29/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Notice - Case Assignment

4/30/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4/30/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less