This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2022 at 00:32:37 (UTC).

CHAZ OLVERA VS STADCO LA, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2022 CHAZ OLVERA filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against STADCO LA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3047

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLVERA CHAZ

Defendants

AECOM

DOE COMPANIES I THROUGH XX INCLUSIVE

DOE CORPORATIONS I THROUGH XX INCLUSIVE

STADCO LA LLC

TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 TO 25 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TERKEURST JONATHAN R.

Defendant Attorneys

MCDERMOTT SAM L.

TORKI SARAH L.

FRIEDENTHAL DANIEL RAY

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint

7/1/2022: Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint

7/1/2022: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

7/1/2022: Answer

Answer

7/1/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/31/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/31/2022: Answer

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/25/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/25/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/25/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/25/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/25/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2025
  • Hearing01/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • Hearing07/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • Hearing07/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Turner Construction Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSummons (CROSS-COMPLAINT); Filed by Turner Construction Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Turner Construction Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Turner Construction Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Turner Construction Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by Turner Construction Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by STADCO LA, LLC (Defendant); Turner Construction Company (Defendant); AECOM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Chaz Olvera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Chaz Olvera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Chaz Olvera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STADCO LA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where TURNER CONSTRUCTION TURNER is a litigant

Latest cases where AECOM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TERKEURST JONATHAN R.