Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/02/2021 at 01:55:10 (UTC).

CHAVEZ, MIGUEL A. VS CHAVEZ, MARIA

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 CHAVEZ, MIGUEL A filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHAVEZ, MARIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HSU, WESLEY L, KIM, ESTHER P., WASHINGTON, LISA R. and HEIDEL, SARAH J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1068

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HSU, WESLEY L

KIM, ESTHER P.

WASHINGTON, LISA R.

HEIDEL, SARAH J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHAVEZ MIGUEL A.

Respondent

CHAVEZ MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RECINOS MICHAEL

Respondent Attorneys

TURNER GORDON EUGENE

SONG RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/1/2021: Minute Order

Statement - of Facts

1/21/2021: Statement - of Facts

Witness List

1/21/2021: Witness List

Proof of Service

1/21/2021: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

1/21/2021: Proof of Service

Declaration - Income and Expense

1/21/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Witness List

1/4/2021: Witness List

Proof of Service

1/4/2021: Proof of Service

Motion - to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Three, Without Any Objctions and Request for Monetary Sanction

6/30/2020: Motion - to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Three, Without Any Objctions and Request for Monetary Sanction

Proof of Service

8/28/2020: Proof of Service

Order - of the Court Setting Trial

9/22/2020: Order - of the Court Setting Trial

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/6/2019: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Request - Trial Setting

6/25/2019: Request - Trial Setting

Declaration - Separate Property

6/25/2019: Declaration - Separate Property

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

6/25/2019: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

7/1/2019: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Proof of Service

7/2/2019: Proof of Service

Proof of Service - Mail

7/29/2019: Proof of Service - Mail

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • Hearing08/17/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department D at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Short Cause Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Hearing08/16/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department D at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal/Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Hearing08/16/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department D at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Short Cause Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department D, Washington, Lisa R., Presiding; Short Cause Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department D, Washington, Lisa R., Presiding; Short Cause Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketStatement - of Facts; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RECINOS MICHAEL