This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2021 at 04:18:24 (UTC).

CHASSITY PINEDA VS ANDY MARTIN

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 CHASSITY PINEDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANDY MARTIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4853

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINEDA CHASSITY

Defendants

MARTIN ANDY

MARTIN MARIA

MARTIN PEDRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSTEIN MICHAEL B.

Defendant Attorneys

MAHLSTEDT JOY L

MAHLSTEDT JOY L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

5/6/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

5/24/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

5/24/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Change of Firm Name

6/3/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/12/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/12/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/21/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/21/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Demand for Jury Trial

8/3/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

8/3/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

9/14/2021: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CHASSITY PINEDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PEDRO MARTIN (Defendant); MARIA MARTIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by PEDRO MARTIN (Defendant); MARIA MARTIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by CHASSITY PINEDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by CHASSITY PINEDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by CHASSITY PINEDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by CHASSITY PINEDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by ANDY MARTIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ANDY MARTIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by ANDY MARTIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CHASSITY PINEDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CHASSITY PINEDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CHASSITY PINEDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDSTEIN MICHAEL B.