This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2020 at 09:24:57 (UTC).

CHASIN, VALERIE YULE - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 CHASIN, VALERIE YULE - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4991

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAY, GUS T.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CHASIN GILBERT A.

CHASIN NICHOLAS D.

Decedent

CHASIN VALERIE YULE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SUTTON RAYMOND MARSHAL

 

Court Documents

Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal - Partial No. 1

12/27/2019: Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal - Partial No. 1

Bond

9/5/2019: Bond

Letters (Initial)

9/5/2019: Letters (Initial)

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

8/29/2019: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Minute Order

8/14/2019: Minute Order

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

8/14/2019: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140)

8/14/2019: Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140)

Will - Admitted

8/14/2019: Will - Admitted

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

8/15/2019: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

7/31/2019: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

Supplement - First Supplement to Petition for Probate and Letters Testamentary

7/31/2019: Supplement - First Supplement to Petition for Probate and Letters Testamentary

Original Will in Safekeeping - 3 pgs - Dated - 10/27/2011 - 19STSK00448

2/22/2019: Original Will in Safekeeping - 3 pgs - Dated - 10/27/2011 - 19STSK00448

Minute Order

7/12/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Publication

6/25/2019: Proof of Publication

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

5/31/2019: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

5/29/2019: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • Hearing09/23/2020 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketInventory & Appraisal (Inventory and Appraisal - Partial No. 1 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketBond; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketSupplement (First Supplement to Petition for Probate and Letters Testamentary ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketOriginal Will in Safekeeping (3 pgs - Dated - 10/27/2011 - 19STSK00448 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUTTON RAYMOND M. ESQ.