This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 21:42:52 (UTC).

CHARMAINE BUTLER VS UNITED INDEPENDENT TAXI DRIVERS

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 CHARMAINE BUTLER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED INDEPENDENT TAXI DRIVERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3036

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUTLER CHARMAINE

Defendant

UNITED INDEPENDENT TAXI DRIVERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRELL SEF

Defendant Attorney

BREMER KEITH

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

9/21/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Answer

10/1/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/31/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/31/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2023
  • Hearing08/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Hearing02/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Hearing02/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by United Independent Taxi Drivers (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Charmaine Butler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Charmaine Butler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Charmaine Butler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED INDEPENDENT TAXI DRIVERS INC. is a litigant