Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2021 at 00:54:46 (UTC).

CHARLUP, KATE T. - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 CHARLUP, KATE T - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7156

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Conservator

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Not Classified By Court

CHARLUP KATE T.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ANAYA-SERNETT STEPHANIE LYNN

Not Classified By Court Attorney

PRICE WILLIAM CECIL

 

Court Documents

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing - Petition For Appointment of Probate Conservatort

12/11/2020: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing - Petition For Appointment of Probate Conservatort

Declaration - Declaration

1/20/2021: Declaration - Declaration

Report - Court Appointed Counsel - 01/22/2021

10/9/2020: Report - Court Appointed Counsel - 01/22/2021

Report - Court Appointed Counsel

9/29/2020: Report - Court Appointed Counsel

Citation - Citation with Proof of Service

9/17/2020: Citation - Citation with Proof of Service

Citation - Citation For Conservatorship

8/31/2020: Citation - Citation For Conservatorship

Doctor's Capacity Declaration - Capacity Declaration-Conservatorship

8/31/2020: Doctor's Capacity Declaration - Capacity Declaration-Conservatorship

Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial) - Petition For Appointment of Probate Conservator

8/31/2020: Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial) - Petition For Appointment of Probate Conservator

PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

8/31/2020: PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

Order - Appointing Counsel

8/31/2020: Order - Appointing Counsel

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration ); Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing - Petition For Appointment of Probate Conservatort ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketReport - Court Appointed Counsel (01/22/2021 ); Filed by Appointed Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketReport - Court Appointed Counsel; Filed by Appointed Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCitation (Citation with Proof of Service ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketProbate Investigations Memo to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCAC Appointment Required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info Sheet (Confidential Supplemental Information ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial) (Petition For Appointment of Probate Conservator ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCitation (Citation For Conservatorship ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Cover Sheet ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDoctor's Capacity Declaration (Capacity Declaration-Conservatorship ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address (Notification to Court of Address on Conservatorship ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less