This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2020 at 06:27:23 (UTC).

CHARLOTTE SHANE VS HEALTHCARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/12/2018 CHARLOTTE SHANE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against HEALTHCARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1857

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SHANE CHARLOTTE

SHANE WILLIAM

SHANE KATELYN

SHANE DAVID

Defendants and Respondents

HEALTHCARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP

GOMEZ GABRIEL A. M.D.

DOES 1 TO 100

MEMORIAL CARE MEDICAL GROUP A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN

JONNALA M.D. PRAVEEN

JONNALA PRAVEEN

GOMEZ GABRIEL

MEMORIAL CARE MEDICAL GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ORAN MICHAEL L. ESQ.

ORAN MICHAEL

ORAN MICHAEL ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

RYAN RICHARD JAMES

KELLY JOHN

WEISSMAN AARON J. ESQ.

KELLY JOHN ESQ.

IRWIN GABRIEL MARSH

RYAN RICHARD J

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/14/2020: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE...)

1/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE...)

Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/28/2020: Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Ruling

1/28/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Change of Firm Name

11/5/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Objection - OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE OFFERED IN SUPPORT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

8/21/2019: Objection - OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE OFFERED IN SUPPORT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

Response to Petition

8/21/2019: Response to Petition

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/21/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/26/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Separate Statement

6/21/2019: Separate Statement

Motion for Summary Judgment

6/21/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/4/2018: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATIONS STANDARDS

9/20/2018: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATIONS STANDARDS

Notice - Notice of Taking Motion to Specially Set Case Off Calendar Without Prejudice

1/28/2019: Notice - Notice of Taking Motion to Specially Set Case Off Calendar Without Prejudice

DEFENDANTS DAVITA MEDICAL GROUP AND GABRIEL A. GOMEZ, M.D.'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

8/22/2018: DEFENDANTS DAVITA MEDICAL GROUP AND GABRIEL A. GOMEZ, M.D.'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/7/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

4/12/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DANAGES: (1) MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

4/12/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DANAGES: (1) MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • Hearing04/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Hearing09/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Hearing08/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketNotice (notice); Filed by Memorial Care Medical Group, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DAVITA MEDICAL GROUP Erroneously Sued As Healthcare Partners Medical Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Memorial Care Medical Group, (Defendant); Praveen Jonnala, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Charlotte Shane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Charlotte Shane (Plaintiff); Charlotte Shane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Healthcare Partners Medical Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Gabriel Gomez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (Proof of Service of Summons); Filed by Charlotte Shane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (Proof of Service of Summons); Filed by Charlotte Shane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DANAGES: (1) MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Charlotte Shane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC701857    Hearing Date: January 23, 2020    Dept: 29

Shane v. Healthcare Partners Medical Group, et al.

Motion for an Order Granting Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint to Make Action One for Wrongful Death; Request to Continue final Status Conference and Trial Dates is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to file the First Amended Complaint within 10 days of the date of this order.

Leave to amend is permitted at the court’s discretion upon any terms that may be just. Cal Code Civ Procedure § 473. The statute is liberally construed to permit amendment of the pleadings. Atkinson v. Elk Corp. (2003) 109 Cal.App.4th 739, 760. If the motion is timely made, and the granting of the motion will not result in prejudice to the opposing party, it is error to refuse permission to amend. Morgan v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County (1959) 172 Cal. App. 2d 527, 530. Defendants do not oppose the motion and have not demonstrated any prejudice.

Given the change in the nature of the case and the addition of new parties and claims, the Court finds good cause to continue trial and related dates. Cal Rules of Court 3.1332(5), (7).

The Court sets the following dates:

FSC: August 18, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Dept. 29 in the Spring Street Courthouse

Trial: September 1, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Dept. 29.

All discovery and motion cut-off dates are to be determined based on the new trial date.

The parties are ordered to inform their witnesses of the new trial date immediately. The trial date is firm; the parties should not expect further continuances.

The Moving party is ordered to give notice.