This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2021 at 00:16:28 (UTC).

CHARLIE KEELING VS CITY PATROL SECURITY SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 CHARLIE KEELING filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CITY PATROL SECURITY SERVICES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7774

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEELING CHARLIE

Defendants

AHMAD SAMIR

CITY PATROL SECURITY SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JABARIN NASSAR

PATROL MASTERS SECURITY SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HATANIAN FARZIN

Defendant Attorney

HAMMAD MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Motion for Terminating Sanctions

11/23/2020: Motion for Terminating Sanctions

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL SUPPLEMENTAL

12/17/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL SUPPLEMENTAL

Order - ORDER RE: MOTION FOR TERMINATING AND MONETARY SANCTIONS

4/8/2021: Order - ORDER RE: MOTION FOR TERMINATING AND MONETARY SANCTIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS)

4/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL HAMMAD IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

5/13/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL HAMMAD IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

Proof of Service by Mail

5/13/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/14/2020

5/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/14/2020

Substitution of Attorney

5/28/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/28/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

5/28/2019: Case Management Statement

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

5/14/2019: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/6/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Charlie Keeling (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketOrder (Re: Motion for Terminating and Monetary Sanctions); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions); Filed by CITY PATROL SECURITY SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); PATROL MASTERS SECURITY SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); Samir Ahmad (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (SUPPLEMENTAL); Filed by CITY PATROL SECURITY SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); PATROL MASTERS SECURITY SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); Samir Ahmad (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Charlie Keeling (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Charlie Keeling (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Charlie Keeling (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Charlie Keeling (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Charlie Keeling (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Charlie Keeling (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Charlie Keeling (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Charlie Keeling (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Charlie Keeling (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HATANINA FARZIN ESQ.