This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 01:20:48 (UTC).

CHARLES WILLIS VS SAM'S CLUB, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 CHARLES WILLIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SAM'S CLUB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1976

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIS CHARLES

Defendants

SAM'S CLUB

WAL-MART STORES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCUS GERALD LEE

Defendant Attorney

BOYD ELLEN R

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

12/17/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

12/17/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2024
  • Hearing11/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • Hearing05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • Hearing05/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sam's Club (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Sam's Club (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Charles Willis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Charles Willis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Charles Willis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAM'S CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCUS GERALD LEE