This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 07:52:08 (UTC).

CHARLES VALTERZA VS PROMISES RESIDENTIAL TREATMENT CENTERS

Case Summary

On 10/03/2017 CHARLES VALTERZA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROMISES RESIDENTIAL TREATMENT CENTERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8149

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALTERZA CHARLES

Defendants and Respondents

MALIBU VISTA

PROMISES RESIDENTIAL TREATMENT CENTERS

WESTSIDE SOBER LIVING CENTERS

DOES 1 TO 100

PROMISES TREATMENT CENTER

VISTA MALIBU

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/19/2019: Minute Order

Order - Dismissal

4/3/2019: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order

4/3/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

4/3/2019: Unknown

SUMMONS

10/3/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/3/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Jury Trial) of 04/03/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Order - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Summons; Filed by CHARLES VALTERZA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by CHARLES VALTERZA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Promises Residential Treatment Center VI, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Westside Sober Living Centers, Inc. is a litigant