This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 12:28:39 (UTC).

CHARLES ROLAND WOOLFOLK, ET AL. VS BANK OF AMERICA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 CHARLES ROLAND WOOLFOLK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0043

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WOOLFOLK CHARLES ROLAND

WOOLFOLK LENA

Defendants

BANK OF AMERICA

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC. DBA AMERICA'S WHOLESALE LENDER

RECON TRUST LOS ANGELES

STRENGTH INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HEHIR E. CHRISTINE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/24/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/22/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/22/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/22/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

3/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/18/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • Hearing08/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bank of America (Defendant); Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. (Defendant); Recon Trust Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Charles Roland Woolfolk (Plaintiff); Lena Woolfolk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Charles Roland Woolfolk (Plaintiff); Lena Woolfolk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Charles Roland Woolfolk (Plaintiff); Lena Woolfolk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Charles Roland Woolfolk (Plaintiff); Lena Woolfolk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Charles Roland Woolfolk (Plaintiff); Lena Woolfolk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Countrywide Home Lons, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEHIR E. CHRISTINE