This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2022 at 09:54:52 (UTC).

CHARLES ROCHELIN VS THE HOME DEPOT

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 CHARLES ROCHELIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE HOME DEPOT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7840

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROCHELIN CHARLES

Defendant

THE HOME DEPOT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEHJATNIA RUSSELL FARZIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/14/2021: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/14/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2024
  • Hearing10/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • Hearing04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • Hearing03/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Charles Rochelin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Charles Rochelin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Charles Rochelin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEHJATNIA RUSSELL F. ESQ.