This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 15:49:50 (UTC).

CHARLES MERIDA VS RUI GUO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 CHARLES MERIDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RUI GUO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4903

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERIDA CHARLES

Defendants

EAST WIND TRANSPORTATION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GUO RUI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL ETHAN O.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/22/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2024
  • Hearing09/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • Hearing03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • Hearing03/08/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CHARLES MERIDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CHARLES MERIDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CHARLES MERIDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CHARLES MERIDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL ETHAN OHAD