This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2021 at 13:25:39 (UTC).

CHARLES J HAOUSMAN VS KABBALAH CHILDRENS ACADEMY ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 CHARLES J HAOUSMAN filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against KABBALAH CHILDRENS ACADEMY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5203

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litems, Not Classified By Court and Plaintiffs

HAUSMAN CHARLES J. AND INDIVIDUALLY

HAUSMAN MIRIAM

Defendants and Respondents

BERG MICHAL

KABBALAH CENTER INTERNATIONAL

DOES 1 TO 20

BRATCHER LINDA

KABBALAH CHILDREN'S ACADEMY

PANTAGES EDRA

ACADEMY KABBALAH CHILDREN'S

KABBALAH CENTRE INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATION

Minor and Not Classified By Court

HAUSMAN MIRIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHIODA GENE HITOSHI ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LITTLER MENDELSON A PROFESSIONAL CORP.

GONZALEZ DANIEL LOPEZ

OLSON SONALI

COHEN NOEL S

Minor Attorney

SHIODA GENE H. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST

3/8/2019: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMES A. KIM RE. AMENDED FILING

4/20/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMES A. KIM RE. AMENDED FILING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE WITH SPECIA...)

3/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE WITH SPECIA...)

Answer

7/22/2019: Answer

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION TO ITS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/25/2019: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION TO ITS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Judicial Notice

5/8/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; Case Manageme...)

3/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; Case Manageme...)

Motion for Leave to Amend - Motion for Leave to Amend COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; AND DECLARATION OF JAMES A. KIM

1/30/2019: Motion for Leave to Amend - Motion for Leave to Amend COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; AND DECLARATION OF JAMES A. KIM

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/29/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/9/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

9/17/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/13/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES OF DEFENDANTS KABBALAH CHILDREN'S ACADEMY, EDRA PANTAZES, MICHAL BERG, AND LINDA BRATCHER, IN SUPPORT OF THEIR DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

8/1/2018: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES OF DEFENDANTS KABBALAH CHILDREN'S ACADEMY, EDRA PANTAZES, MICHAL BERG, AND LINDA BRATCHER, IN SUPPORT OF THEIR DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

7/10/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

5/3/2018: SUMMONS -

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

3/12/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

3/15/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Following Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Hausman, Charles J. and individually (Plaintiff); Miriam Hausman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Hausman, Charles J. and individually (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Following Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continued Hearing); Filed by Hausman, Charles J. and individually (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Following Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise (with Special Needs Trust) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Following Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Specia...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continued Hearing); Filed by Hausman, Charles J. and individually (Plaintiff); Miriam Hausman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. STATUTORY NEGLIGENCE; 2. NEGLIGENCE; AND 3. DEFAMATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC695203    Hearing Date: April 22, 2021    Dept: 74

BC695203 CHARLES J HAOUSMAN VS KABBALAH CHILDRENS ACADEMY

Petition to Approve Minor’s Compromise with Special Needs Trust

TENTATIVE RULING: Per CRC 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the hearing unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court will grant the petition if it is satisfied with the testimony presented.

The disputed claims consist of legal causes of action against defendant Kabbalah Children’s Academy (“KCA”) asserted by petitioner Charles Hausman (“Petitioner”) on behalf of himself as parent of the minor and as a contracting party to the agreements with defendant KCA. In addition, the claims consist of legal causes of action against defendants KCS, Edra Pantazes (erroneously sued as Edra Pantages), Michal Berg; and Linda Bratcher, asserted by Petitioner on behalf of claimant Miriam Hausman (“Claimant”) as guardian ad litem.

Here, Claimant, who is 14 years old, experienced emotional injuries as a fifth-grade student at KCA when she was erroneously identified as having a learning disability after a faculty member at KCA gave failing grades to Claimant on her report card.

Petitioner was informed that the teacher evaluating Claimant as failing all her subjects was qualified and experienced with students with learning disabilities. Based on these representations, Petitioner had Claimant undergo formal evaluation for learning disabilities. Ultimately, after extensive evaluation by specialists, it was determined that Claimant had no learning disability. It was also determined that Claimant did not have minimal knowledge and education in certain subjects. Consequently, the ordeal caused emotional harm to Claimant.

Petitioner has agreed to settle the action for a total of $ 37,500. If approved, $ 4,125 of the settlement will be used for attorneys’ fees, $ 2,953.97 for costs of suit and $10,000 for other expenses. The remaining balance will be placed in a blocked account.

The Court has reviewed the settlement and finds it is fair and reasonable. The Court also finds the attorneys’ fees fair and reasonable, in that they amount to 11% of the total settlement and are supported by a declaration of counsel and the parties’ attorney-client fee retainer agreement.

Per CRC 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the hearing unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court will grant the petition if it is satisfied with the testimony presented.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KABBALAH CHILDREN'S ACADEMY is a litigant

Latest cases where KABBALAH CENTRE INTERNATIONAL INCORPORA- is a litigant