This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2018 at 14:43:02 (UTC).

CHARLES HILL VS ANHEUSER BUSCH WHOLESALER DEVELOPMENT CORP

Case Summary

On 04/12/2017 CHARLES HILL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ANHEUSER BUSCH WHOLESALER DEVELOPMENT CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAREN E. NELSON and MAREN NELSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9247

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAREN E. NELSON

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HILL CHARLES

Defendant and Respondent

ANHEUSER BUSCH WHOLESALER DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

TRACY MICHAEL L. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MITCHELL SILEBERG & KNUPP LLP

 

Court Documents

Judgment

12/8/2017: Judgment

Declaration

9/18/2018: Declaration

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

12/8/2017: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Declaration

11/13/2017: Declaration

Minute Order

11/15/2017: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

11/21/2017: Notice of Ruling

Declaration

12/1/2017: Declaration

Other -

12/1/2017: Other -

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/20/2017: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

6/5/2017: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration

6/5/2017: Declaration

Notice

6/5/2017: Notice

Stipulation and Order

6/16/2017: Stipulation and Order

Minute Order

6/27/2017: Minute Order

Order

6/29/2017: Order

Other -

7/27/2017: Other -

Brief

9/5/2017: Brief

Declaration

9/26/2017: Declaration

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Declaration DECLARATION OF NATHALIE HERNANDEZ OF ILYM GROUP, INC REGARDING DISBURSEMENT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 307; Fairness Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Anheuser Busch Wholesaler Development (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Minute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Default Judgment -JUDGMENT OF FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Case File - Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Declaration -DECLARATION OF MICHAEL TRACY IN SUPPORT OF PARTIES' SUPPLEMENTAL FILING IN SUPPORT OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2017
  • Declaration DECLARATION OF KEVIN E. GAUT IN SUPPORT OF PETITION BY ALL PARTIES TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L. TRACY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION BY ALL PARTIES TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 307; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX CASES AND CLASS ACTIONS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Charles Hill (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Case File - Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • PETITION TO CONFIRM, CORRECT, OR VACATE CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION)

    Read MoreRead Less