This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 12:44:15 (UTC).

CHARLES HENRY BIBBY ET AL VS CHAMPIONS LEAGUE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/02/2017 CHARLES HENRY BIBBY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHAMPIONS LEAGUE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1796

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BIBBY CHARLES HENRY

MONROE VERNON EARL

ROES 1 TO 1000

Defendants and Respondents

ASKEW JOHN

CHAMPIONS LEAGUE INCORPORATION

LOS ANGELES SUPERSTARS INCORPORATION

GEORGE CARL

DOES 1 TO 100

LOS ANGELES SUPERSTARS INC.

CHAMPIONS LEAGUE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GERAGOS MARK J. ESQ.

GERAGOS MARK JOHN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/5/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

6/21/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Unknown

10/10/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

10/10/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/21/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

12/26/2018: Unknown

Notice of Stay of Proceedings

1/24/2019: Notice of Stay of Proceedings

Notice of Stay of Proceedings

1/24/2019: Notice of Stay of Proceedings

Proof of Service by Mail

1/24/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order

1/25/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/27/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/27/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/29/2019: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/1/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

12/8/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

12/8/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

12/12/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

12/12/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Default) of 05/29/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 24; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Status Conference Re: Bank...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2017
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Charles Henry Bibby (Plaintiff); Vernon Earl Monroe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Charles Henry Bibby (Plaintiff); Vernon Earl Monroe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Charles Henry Bibby (Plaintiff); Vernon Earl Monroe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Charles Henry Bibby (Plaintiff); Vernon Earl Monroe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC681796    Hearing Date: November 20, 2019    Dept: 24

Plaintiffs Charles Henry Bibby and Vernon Earl Monroe’s motion to vacate the dismissal entered on June 26, 2019 is GRANTED.

On November 2, 2017, Plaintiffs Charles Henry Bibby and Vernon Earl Monroe brought the instant breach of contract and fraud suit against Defendants Champions League Inc., Los Angeles Superstars Inc., Carl George, and John Askew.

On May 29, 2019, the Court held an OSC Re: Default. Plaintiffs failed to appear. The Court therefore set an OSC Re: Dismissal for Plaintiffs’ Failure to Appear and Prosecute for June 26, 2019. The clerk gave notice via minute order.

On June 26, 2019, Plaintiffs failed to appear at the OSC Re: Dismissal and the Court dismissed the suit.

On August 19, 2019, Plaintiffs filed a motion to vacate the dismissal. No opposition was filed.

Legal Standard

Relief under section 473(b) is either discretionary or mandatory. A motion for mandatory relief must be made no more than six months after entry of judgment and be accompanied by an attorney’s sworn affidavit attesting to the attorney’s “mistake, inadvertence, surprise or neglect.” (CCP § 473(b).) The attorney affidavit of fault must contain a “straight forward admission of fault.” (State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. v. Pietak (2001) 90 Cal.App.4th 600, 610.) But it need not contain an explanation of the reasons for the attorney’s mistake, inadvertence surprise or neglect. (Martin Potts & Assocs., Inc. v. Corsair, LLC (2016) 244 Cal.App.4th 432, 438-441.)

Relief must be granted “unless the court finds that the default or dismissal was not in fact caused by the attorney's mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or neglect.” (Ibid.) If mandatory relief is granted, the court must “direct the attorney to pay reasonable compensatory legal fees and costs” to the opposing counsel or parties. (CCP § 473(b).)

Where a party cannot obtain an attorney affidavit of fault, the party may seek discretionary relief under section 473(b) due to “mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or excusable neglect.” (CCP § 473(b).) A motion for discretionary relief must be made “within a reasonable time but in no instance exceeding six months after the judgment, dismissal, order, or proceeding was taken.” (Id.) If discretionary relief is granted, the court may in its discretion order the moving party to pay the costs, including attorney fees, incurred in obtaining the default. (Rogalski v. Nabers Cadillac (1992) 11 Cal.App.4th 816, 823; Vanderkous v. Conley (2010) 188 Cal.App.4th 111, 118-119.) If the motion for discretionary relief is granted, the court may order the offending attorney to pay monetary sanctions up to $1,000 to opposing parties, or up to $1,000 to the State Bar Client Security Fund, or “[g]rant other relief as is appropriate.” (CCP § 473(c)(1)(A), (B), (C).)

A motion for relief under section 473(b) “shall be accompanied by a copy of the answer or other pleading proposed to be filed therein, otherwise the application shall not be granted. . .” (CCP § 473(b).) However, this requirement is not jurisdictional; substantial compliance may suffice. (Carmel, Ltd. v. Tavoussi hearing rather than serving it with moving papers].) 

Discussion

Here, Plaintiffs request relief from the dismissal on discretionary grounds. Plaintiffs argue good cause is shown because they did not receive notice of the OSC that led to the dismissal.

Counsel’s declaration indicates that they never received notice of the hearing, the hearing was therefore not reflected on their calendar, and there is no record of the clerk’s notice. (Das Decl., ¶ 3.)

The Court notes that a Certificate of Mailing is present which indicates that the clerk served the minute order to Plaintiffs’ counsel via mail. (See 6/26/2019 Cert. of Mailing.) Despite this, the Court will still grant discretionary relief, since no prejudice is apparent.

Accordingly, Plaintiffs’ motion is GRANTED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.