This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 00:24:12 (UTC).

CHARLES FAZIO VS. DEBRA L. REED, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/25/2018 CHARLES FAZIO filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against DEBRA L REED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9897

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAZIO CHARLES DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF

Defendants

HOUSEHOLDER JOSEPH A.

BOECKMANN ALAN L.

MIHALIK TREVOR I.

SEMPRA ENERGY

RUSNACK WILLIAM C.

BROWN KATHLEEN L.

SCHENK LYNN

FERRERO PABLO A.

ARRIOLA DENNIS V.

JONES WILLIAM D.

LANE J. BRET

REED DEBRA L.

FOLKMANN BRUCE

RUTLEDGE WILLIAM P.

YARDLEY JAMES C.

SNELL MARK A.

TAYLOR JACK T.

OUCHI WILLIAM G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

RM LAW P.C.

ROSMAN & GERMAIN LLP

THE WEISER LAW FIRM P.C.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

O'MELVENY & MYERS LLP

SKADDEN ARPS SLATE MEAGHER & FLOM LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/5/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/22/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order

5/29/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Related Cases

1/25/2018: Notice of Related Cases

SUMMONS

1/25/2018: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

1/25/2018: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

1/25/2018: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

1/25/2018: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

1/25/2018: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

1/25/2018: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

1/25/2018: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

1/25/2018: SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MANDATORY EFILE CASE

1/25/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MANDATORY EFILE CASE

REGISTER OF ACTIONS NOTICE

1/25/2018: REGISTER OF ACTIONS NOTICE

NOTICE OF CASE TRANSMITTAL AND NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF TRANSFERRED CASE (CCP 399)

1/25/2018: NOTICE OF CASE TRANSMITTAL AND NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF TRANSFERRED CASE (CCP 399)

STIPULATION RE: TRANSFER OF CASE TO THE LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

1/25/2018: STIPULATION RE: TRANSFER OF CASE TO THE LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

1/25/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

1/25/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-06-08 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 71; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-05-29 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Incoming Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SIGNING OF AN ORDER RE CHANGE OF VENUE AND REQUEST FOR PAYMENT OF FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MANDATORY EFILE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CHARLES, DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF FAZIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

st" o '.‘-\-h P ot

BC679897

2. Iserved copies of the Summons; Shareholder Derivative Complaint; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Notice of Case Assignment; ADR

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSEHOLDER JOSEPH A. is a litigant