This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2023 at 08:40:14 (UTC).

CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS VINEPARK MOBIL, LLC., A BUSINESS ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 CHARLES E THOMAS COMPANY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VINEPARK MOBIL, LLC , A BUSINESS ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5712

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

NATANZI BRUCE

OPEN BANK A BUSINESS ENTITY

STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA INC.

VINEPARK MOBIL LLC. A BUSINESS ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHACHTER ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

ROBERTS KENNETH P.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

8/30/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/28/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

8/14/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

8/11/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Continuance

6/8/2023: Notice of Continuance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

5/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Continuance

4/10/2023: Notice of Continuance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CA...)

3/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CA...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT SCHACHTER RE: STATUS OF MATTER

3/28/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT SCHACHTER RE: STATUS OF MATTER

Notice - NOTICE OF RECORDED LIS PENDENS

12/19/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF RECORDED LIS PENDENS

Notice of Lis Pendens

11/22/2022: Notice of Lis Pendens

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/21/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2023
  • Hearing11/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: Charles E. Thomas Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Charles E. Thomas Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Open Bank, a business entity (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Date: 08/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/28/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Charles E. Thomas Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart Title of California, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Date: 08/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Bruce Natanzi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: Charles E. Thomas Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketAddress for Robert Schachter (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Charles E. Thomas Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Vinepark Mobil, LLC., a business entity (Defendant); Bruce Natanzi (Defendant); Open Bank, a business entity (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Charles E. Thomas Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Vinepark Mobil, LLC., a business entity (Defendant); Bruce Natanzi (Defendant); Open Bank, a business entity (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Charles E. Thomas Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Vinepark Mobil, LLC., a business entity (Defendant); Bruce Natanzi (Defendant); Open Bank, a business entity (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gregory Keosian in Department 61 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less