*******5712
11/10/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Other Contract
Los Angeles, California
GREGORY KEOSIAN
CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
NATANZI BRUCE
OPEN BANK A BUSINESS ENTITY
STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA INC.
VINEPARK MOBIL LLC. A BUSINESS ENTITY
SCHACHTER ROBERT
ROBERTS KENNETH P.
9/13/2023: Notice of Continuance
8/30/2023: Proof of Personal Service
8/28/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
8/14/2023: Proof of Personal Service
8/11/2023: Case Management Statement
6/8/2023: Notice of Continuance
5/30/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)
5/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service
5/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service
4/10/2023: Notice of Continuance
3/30/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Ca...)
3/28/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Robert Schachter Re: Status of Matter
12/19/2022: Notice (name extension) Notice of Recorded Lis Pendens
11/22/2022: Notice of Lis Pendens
11/21/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
11/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference
11/10/2022: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet
11/10/2022: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing
Hearing11/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: Charles E. Thomas Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Charles E. Thomas Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Open Bank, a business entity (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Date: 08/29/2023
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/28/2023 10:00 AM
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Charles E. Thomas Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart Title of California, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Date: 08/10/2023
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Bruce Natanzi (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: Charles E. Thomas Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61
[-] Read LessDocketAddress for Robert Schachter (Attorney) updated
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Charles E. Thomas Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Vinepark Mobil, LLC., a business entity (Defendant); Bruce Natanzi (Defendant); Open Bank, a business entity (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Charles E. Thomas Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Vinepark Mobil, LLC., a business entity (Defendant); Bruce Natanzi (Defendant); Open Bank, a business entity (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Charles E. Thomas Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Vinepark Mobil, LLC., a business entity (Defendant); Bruce Natanzi (Defendant); Open Bank, a business entity (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Gregory Keosian in Department 61 Stanley Mosk Courthouse
[-] Read Less