This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2020 at 15:24:19 (UTC).

CHARLES DEVINE VS. GEM HEALTHCARE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2017 CHARLES DEVINE filed an Other lawsuit against GEM HEALTHCARE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN, LAURA A. MATZ, RALPH C. HOFER and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7565

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

LAURA A. MATZ

RALPH C. HOFER

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEVINE CHARLES

DEVINE RICHARD

Defendants

SAINT CABRINI HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC

GEM HEALTHCARE LLC

GEM HEALTCARE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARCIA ARTIGLIERE & SCHADRACK

GARCIA STEPHEN M.

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

BAKER DANIEL W

WALKER KATHLEEN MARIE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/2/2019: Request for Dismissal

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OSC-FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERV

11/3/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OSC-FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERV

Summons

11/3/2017: Summons

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

1/2/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-03-02 00:00:00

3/2/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-03-02 00:00:00

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

3/2/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-04-13 00:00:00

4/13/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-04-13 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

7/5/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-08-16 00:00:00

8/16/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-08-16 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-09-27 00:00:00

9/27/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-09-27 00:00:00

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

11/30/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

2/27/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

3/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Other - - OTHER - CLERK OF COURT NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR AND CORRECTION

3/19/2019: Other - - OTHER - CLERK OF COURT NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR AND CORRECTION

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

10/12/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore -

8/16/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore -

Notice of Ruling -

7/16/2018: Notice of Ruling -

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CHARLES DEVINE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Other - Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketOther - (Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2017
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department B; (Case Ordered Reassigned; Case is reassigned) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-11-14 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Richard Devine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Richard Devine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Richard Devine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Richard Devine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEM HEALTHCARE LLC DBA GEM TRANSITIONAL CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where SAINT CABRINI HEALTHCARE SERVICES,LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALKER KATHLEEN M. ESQ.