This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/03/2021 at 17:19:09 (UTC).

CHARLES BROQUARD VS JOSE B. AND MARIA L. VIGIL FAMILY TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 2002, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 CHARLES BROQUARD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSE B AND MARIA L VIGIL FAMILY TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 2002. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0687

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROQUARD CHARLES

Defendants

JOSE B. AND MARIA L. VIGIL FAMILY TRUST

VIGIL MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HESS MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

KRAMER BRENT ADAM

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

10/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS MICHAEL VIGIL AND JOSE B AND MARIA L VIGIL FAMILY TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 2002S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE AND SHORTEN TIME ON ITS MOTION F

10/25/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS MICHAEL VIGIL AND JOSE B AND MARIA L VIGIL FAMILY TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 2002S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE AND SHORTEN TIME ON ITS MOTION F

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

10/19/2021: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

9/28/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO REFER MATTER TO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

9/28/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO REFER MATTER TO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

9/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Informal Discovery Conference

9/16/2021: Informal Discovery Conference

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; ORDER THEREON

8/16/2021: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; ORDER THEREON

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL) OF 08/19/2021

8/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL) OF 08/19/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

8/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/24/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

5/24/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/24/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

5/24/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

7/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/9/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • Hearing12/06/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Hearing12/02/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Hearing11/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Hearing11/22/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 205 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Advance and Shorten Time on Its Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Charles Broquard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Cancellation of Ex Parte Application); Filed by Jose B. and Maria L. Vigil Family Trust Dated November 19, 2002 (Defendant); Michael Vigil (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Advance and Shorten Time on Its Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings); Filed by Jose B. and Maria L. Vigil Family Trust Dated November 19, 2002 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketMotion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by Jose B. and Maria L. Vigil Family Trust Dated November 19, 2002 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (OF BRENT A. KRAMER, ESQ. ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS JOSE B. AND MARIA L. VIGIL FAMILY TRUST dated November 19, 2002 AND MICHAEL VIGIL FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CCP 430.41); Filed by Jose B. and Maria L. Vigil Family Trust Dated November 19, 2002 (Defendant); Michael Vigil (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Charles Broquard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Charles Broquard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Charles Broquard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Charles Broquard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRAMER BRENT ADAM