Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2021 at 05:51:20 (UTC).

CHARLES ALLEN VS MAGIC MOUNTAIN, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 CHARLES ALLEN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MAGIC MOUNTAIN, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0103

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEN CHARLES

Defendant

MAGIC MOUNTAIN LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

AMARO MICHAEL LEE

Other Attorneys

TOJO KRISTEN MIYUKI

 

Court Documents

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

3/24/2021: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: EXHIBIT "A" TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: EXHIBIT "A" TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/11/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service

2/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/11/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • Hearing02/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Hearing05/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by Magic Mountain, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Errata Re: Exhibit "A" to Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by Charles Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Charles Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Charles Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Charles Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Charles Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Charles Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAGIC MOUNTAIN LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOJO KRISTEN MIYUKI