This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/24/2021 at 12:26:31 (UTC).

CHARLENE QUINTANA VS CRY-HELP, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 CHARLENE QUINTANA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CRY-HELP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY W. ALARCON and DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0996

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY W. ALARCON

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUINTANA CHARLENE

Defendant

CRY-HELP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEGAKIS CHRISTINA

Defendant Attorney

MEYER KRYSTLE D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/11/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

1/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

2/18/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Answer

2/18/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

4/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/11/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Order

5/10/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

10/20/2021: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CHARLENE QUINTANA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by CHARLENE QUINTANA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CRY-HELP, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CHARLENE QUINTANA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CRY-HELP, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by CRY-HELP, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CHARLENE QUINTANA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CHARLENE QUINTANA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CHARLENE QUINTANA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CHARLENE QUINTANA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less