This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2022 at 21:38:34 (UTC).

CHARLENE POWELL, ET AL. VS CALIFORNIA AFRICAN AMERICAN MUSEUM, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 CHARLENE POWELL, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CALIFORNIA AFRICAN AMERICAN MUSEUM, A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1859

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIMS KENNEDY

POWELL CHARLENE

Defendants

DAVIS GEORGE O.

THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

CALIFORNIA SCIENCE CENTER FOUNDATION

CALIFORNIA SCIENCE CENTER

CALIFORNIA AFRICAN AMERICAN MUSEUM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABROLAT NANCY

Defendant Attorney

JALILI VICTORIA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/15/2021: Complaint

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST) (2ND)

4/19/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST) (2ND)

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY TO DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/7/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY TO DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Settlement

2/9/2022: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

3/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

2/10/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/17/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

5/17/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS CHARLENE POWELL AND KENNEDY MIMS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS CALIFORNIA AFRICAN AMERICAN MUSEUM, CALIFORNIA SCIENCE CENTER, THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, GEORGE

6/1/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS CHARLENE POWELL AND KENNEDY MIMS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS CALIFORNIA AFRICAN AMERICAN MUSEUM, CALIFORNIA SCIENCE CENTER, THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, GEORGE

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JENNIFER OLIVARES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CHARLENE POWELL AND PLAINTIFF KENNEDY MIMS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS CALIFORNIA AFRICAN AMERICAN MUSEUM,

6/1/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JENNIFER OLIVARES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CHARLENE POWELL AND PLAINTIFF KENNEDY MIMS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS CALIFORNIA AFRICAN AMERICAN MUSEUM,

Case Management Statement

6/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

6/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/18/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/18/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Amended Complaint - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/29/2021: Amended Complaint - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/26/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 34; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Charlene Powell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer (TO PLAINTIFFS? SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by California African American Museum (Defendant); California Science Center (Defendant); The State of California (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSecond Amended Complaint; Filed by Charlene Powell (Plaintiff); Kennedy Mims (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Charlene Powell (Plaintiff); Kennedy Mims (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by California African American Museum (Defendant); California Science Center (Defendant); The State of California (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by California African American Museum (Defendant); California Science Center (Defendant); George O. Davis (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Charlene Powell (Plaintiff); Kennedy Mims (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Charlene Powell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Victoria N. Jalili in Support of Automatic 30 Day Extension to File Responsive Pleading Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 430.41(a)(2)); Filed by California African American Museum (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Charlene Powell (Plaintiff); Kennedy Mims (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Charlene Powell (Plaintiff); Kennedy Mims (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Charlene Powell (Plaintiff); Kennedy Mims (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Charlene Powell (Plaintiff); Kennedy Mims (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1859    Hearing Date: April 29, 2021    Dept: 34

SUBJECT: Demurrer and Motion to Strike

Moving Party: Defendants State of California, California African American Museum, California Science Center, and George Davis

Resp. Party: None

The demurrer and motion to strike are taken OFF-CALENDAR as MOOT.

BACKGROUND:

This action arises out of allegations of gender harassment, discrimination, and retaliation the Plaintiffs endured in the California African American Museum workplace.

On January 15, 2021, Plaintiffs Charlene Powell and Kennedy Mims commenced this action against Defendants California African American Museum, California Science Center, California Science Center Foundation, The State of California, and George O. Davis for (1) violation of the FEHA – gender discrimination; (2) violation of the FEHA – gender harassment; (3) violation of the FEHA – retaliation; (4) violation of the FEHA – failure to accommodate; (5) violation of the FEHA – failure to engage in the interactive process; (6) violation of the FEHA – failure to investigate/prevent/correct FEHA violations; (7) wrongful retaliation in violation of public policy; (8) false promise/intentional misrepresentation; (9) violation of California Wage and Hour Law and Regulation; and (10) Unfair Competition.

On March 22, 2021, Defendants State of California, California African American Museum (“CAAM”), California Science Center (“Science Center”), and George Davis filed the instant demurrer and motion to strike.

On April 19, 2021, Plaintiffs filed a first amended complaint against Defendants California African American Museum, California Science Center, California Science Center Foundation, The State of California, and George O. Davis for (1) violation of the FEHA – gender discrimination; (2) violation of the FEHA – gender harassment; (3) violation of the FEHA – retaliation; (4) violation of the FEHA – failure to accommodate; (5) violation of the FEHA – failure to engage in the interactive process; (6) violation of the FEHA – failure to investigate/prevent/correct FEHA violations; (7) false promise/intentional misrepresentation; (8) violation of California Labor Code – business expense reimbursement; and (1) violation of California Labor Code – overtime.

ANALYSIS:

This is a demurrer and a motion to strike brought by Defendants as to the causes of action in the complaint. However, Plaintiffs filed a first amended complaint on April 19, 2021. Therefore, the demurrer and motion to strike are taken OFF-CALENDAR as MOOT.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA SCIENCE CENTER A CORPORATION is a litigant