This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2022 at 13:24:55 (UTC).

CHARLENE LAENG VS KEOLIS TRANSIT AMERICA, INC

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 CHARLENE LAENG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KEOLIS TRANSIT AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7761

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAENG CHARLENE

Defendants

KEOLIS TRANSIT AMERICA INC

ORTIZ JORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

YAGHOUBTIL FARID

FARMER JERLISIA

Defendant Attorney

CANADA RICHARD BRENT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/14/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/14/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

1/21/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Answer

4/6/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

4/6/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Substitution of Attorney

4/19/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/10/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/24/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2023
  • Hearing12/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • Hearing06/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • Hearing06/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Charlene Laeng (Plaintiff); KEOLIS TRANSIT AMERICA, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by KEOLIS TRANSIT AMERICA, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Charlene Laeng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Charlene Laeng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by KEOLIS TRANSIT AMERICA, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by KEOLIS TRANSIT AMERICA, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Charlene Laeng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Charlene Laeng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Charlene Laeng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Charlene Laeng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEOLIS TRANSIT AMERICA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARMER JERLISIA ESQ