This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 02:56:45 (UTC).

CHARITY CARRASCO VS PURE DENTAL SOLUTIONS

Case Summary

On 01/06/2017 CHARITY CARRASCO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PURE DENTAL SOLUTIONS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5995

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRASCO CHARITY

Defendant

PURE DENTAL SOLUTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIBIYAN DAVID D.

Defendant Attorneys

KATUNICH LAUREN JEAN

AHDOOT ELIZABETH REBECCA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/27/2018: Minute Order

Motion for Final Approval of Settlement

11/13/2018: Motion for Final Approval of Settlement

Order

1/10/2019: Order

Supplemental Declaration

2/13/2019: Supplemental Declaration

Minute Order

3/5/2019: Minute Order

Other -

4/18/2019: Other -

Minute Order

4/25/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

4/25/2019: Unknown

Order

4/25/2019: Order

Notice

4/30/2019: Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketNotice (of April 19, 2019 Minute Order); Filed by Charity Carrasco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketOrder (Granting Preliminary Approval of Class and Representative Action Settlement and Certifying Class for Settlement Purposes Only); Filed by Charity Carrasco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketJoint Report of Parties RE Preliminary Approval of Stipulation for Class Action and Representative Action Settlement; Filed by Charity Carrasco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration (of David D. Bibiyan in support of Settlement of Class Action and PAGA claims); Filed by Charity Carrasco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Charity Carrasco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketNotice PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 307; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Case is reassigned) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-01-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (Code Civ. Proc., - 170.6)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Charity Carrasco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketCLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Charity Carrasco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5995    Hearing Date: December 03, 2019    Dept: 14

CHARITY CARRASCO v. PURE DENTAL SOLUTIONS

MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR FEES, COSTS, AND INCENTIVE PAYMENT

TENTATIVE RULING

Grant Final Approval contingent on counsel providing an updated declaration from the administrator after the response deadline has passed. Contingent on the above, the Court awards/approves the following: (1) $50,000 for attorneys’ fees to class counsel; (2) $7,995.62 for attorneys’ costs to class counsel; (3) $5,000 for a service award to the class representative; (4) $4,750 for costs of settlement administration to Phoenix Settlement Administrators; and (5) $3,750 (75% of the $5,000 PAGA penalty) payable to the LWDA. Counsel is to file a proposed order containing the class definition and full release language.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PURE DENTAL SOLUTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIBIYAN DAVID D.