This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2020 at 16:45:23 (UTC).

CHAO YAN VS QIANG MA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 CHAO YAN filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against QIANG MA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2028

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YAN CHAO

Defendants

MA RICK

MA QIANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELL JEFFREY T.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/2/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

11/9/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY T .BELL

11/6/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY T .BELL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

11/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Request for Dismissal

11/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 82; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Temporary Injunction) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Temporary Injunction); Filed by Chao Yan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docketat 3:03 PM in Department 82; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Jeffrey T .Bell); Filed by Chao Yan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Chao Yan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Chao Yan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Chao Yan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Chao Yan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELL JEFFREY THOMAS ESQ.