This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 02:57:02 (UTC).

CHANT YEDALIAN VS ANDREWS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 CHANT YEDALIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANDREWS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1200

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YEDALIAN CHANT

Defendant

ANDREWS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEDALIAN CHANT

Defendant Attorneys

DZIEL COLLEEN

CHANG STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES PLAINTIFF CHANT YEDALIANS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES PLAINTIFF CHANT YEDALIANS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

6/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 06/17/2021

6/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 06/17/2021

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

5/27/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CHANT YEDALIAN IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO QUASH; AND EXHIBITS 19-31

5/27/2021: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CHANT YEDALIAN IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO QUASH; AND EXHIBITS 19-31

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS MOTION BY SPECI...) OF 05/13/2021

5/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS MOTION BY SPECI...) OF 05/13/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

3/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

2/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHANT YEDALIAN IN RESPONSE TO: DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE C. CHANG TO REQUEST A CONTINUANCE OF THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM MARCH 1, 2021 TO AUGUST 19, 2021

1/26/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHANT YEDALIAN IN RESPONSE TO: DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE C. CHANG TO REQUEST A CONTINUANCE OF THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM MARCH 1, 2021 TO AUGUST 19, 2021

Proof of Service by Mail

12/3/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHANT YEDALIAN IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ANDREWS FEDERAL CREDIT UNIONS DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

12/3/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHANT YEDALIAN IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ANDREWS FEDERAL CREDIT UNIONS DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH

12/15/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/5/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/5/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • Hearing09/19/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • Hearing09/02/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (PLAINTIFF CHANT YEDALIAN?S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES); Filed by CHANT YEDALIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CHANT YEDALIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ANDREWS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ANDREWS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by ANDREWS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by ANDREWS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF CHANT YEDALIAN IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ANDREWS FEDERAL CREDIT UNIONS DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION); Filed by CHANT YEDALIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by CHANT YEDALIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension); Filed by ANDREWS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CHANT YEDALIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CHANT YEDALIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CHANT YEDALIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANDREWS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEZIEL COLLEEN ANN