This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2021 at 19:17:52 (UTC).

CHANELL PIERCE, ET AL. VS DON MARC COUNTRY CLUB LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 CHANELL PIERCE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DON MARC COUNTRY CLUB LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3742

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DORSEY LARISA

PIERCE CHANELL

Defendant

DON MARC COUNTRY CLUB LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/25/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • Hearing10/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CHANELL PIERCE (Plaintiff); LARISA DORSEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CHANELL PIERCE (Plaintiff); LARISA DORSEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CHANELL PIERCE (Plaintiff); LARISA DORSEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O