This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2022 at 09:59:36 (UTC).

CHANDLER JEAN WANGRUD VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 CHANDLER JEAN WANGRUD filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0860

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WANGRUD CHANDLER JEAN

Defendants

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC.

PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIM ELEAZAR D.

XIE MATT

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/23/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/30/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

12/15/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/23/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • Hearing05/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Signed and Filed by: Chandler Jean Wangrud (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): Filed By: Chandler Jean Wangrud (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Chandler Jean Wangrud (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 12/12/2022; Service Cost: 109.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Vicencia in Department S26 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Chandler Jean Wangrud (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Chandler Jean Wangrud (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Chandler Jean Wangrud (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer XIE MATT