This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2022 at 15:10:05 (UTC).

CHAN KI KIM VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 CHAN KI KIM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTHONY MOHR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0352

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTHONY MOHR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM CHAN KI

Defendant

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE DAVID

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/18/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/18/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

5/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/6/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

6/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/13/2022

6/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/13/2022

Order - ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS THE ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE

6/13/2022: Order - ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS THE ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS

6/13/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • Docketat 2:06 PM in Department A, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 06/13/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Dismiss); Filed by BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketOrder (Stipulation to dismiss the entire case with prejudice); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Chan Ki Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Chan Ki Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Chan Ki Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Chan Ki Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant