This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2023 at 14:59:04 (UTC).

CHAIM S. SETAREH VS MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 CHAIM S SETAREH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0253

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SETAREH CHAIM S.

Defendants

ELEVATED RETURNS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

STARWOOD HOTELS & RESORTS WORLDWIDE LLC A MARYLAND LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ELEVATED RETURNS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIBB TYSON JAMES

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/23/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/23/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/23/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/23/2023: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

2/9/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/9/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3/2/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

3/30/2023: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/30/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

3/30/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2023
  • Hearing07/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Chaim S. Setareh (Plaintiff); As to: Elevated Returns, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Elevated Returns, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 03/10/2023; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Chaim S. Setareh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketNotice Plaintiffs Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Chaim S. Setareh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Santa Monica Courthouse in Department N - Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeldeffective 03/02/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Chaim S. Setareh (Plaintiff); As to: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC, a Maryland limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 01/31/2023; Service Cost: 32.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Chaim S. Setareh (Plaintiff); As to: Marriott International, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 01/31/2023; Service Cost: 32.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Chaim S. Setareh (Plaintiff); As to: Marriott International, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC, a Maryland limited liability company (Defendant); Elevated Returns, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Chaim S. Setareh (Plaintiff); As to: Marriott International, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC, a Maryland limited liability company (Defendant); Elevated Returns, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Chaim S. Setareh (Plaintiff); As to: Marriott International, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC, a Maryland limited liability company (Defendant); Elevated Returns, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Craig D. Karlan in Department N Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less