This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/17/2023 at 05:05:32 (UTC).

CHAE CHIN CHOE VS ANDREA ROTHFEDIDA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 CHAE CHIN CHOE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ANDREA ROTHFEDIDA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8974

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHOE CHAE CHIN

Defendants

FEDIDA ANDREA

FEDIDA RAPHY

ROTHFEDIDA ANDREA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAKHSHESHIAN JONATHAN

Defendant Attorney

CULLINS DOUGLAS DRAKE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/10/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/10/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/10/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

6/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/15/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/15/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/12/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2024
  • Hearing06/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2023
  • Hearing12/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2023
  • Hearing11/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Chae Chin Choe (Plaintiff); As to: Raphy Fedida (Defendant); Service Date: 08/21/2022; Service Cost: 116.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Andrea Rothfedida (Defendant); Raphy Fedida (Defendant); As to: Chae Chin Choe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Andrea Rothfedida (Defendant); Raphy Fedida (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Chae Chin Choe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Chae Chin Choe (Plaintiff); As to: Andrea Fedida (Defendant); Service Date: 06/14/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Chae Chin Choe (Plaintiff); As to: Andrea Rothfedida (Defendant); Service Date: 06/14/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Chae Chin Choe (Plaintiff); As to: Andrea Rothfedida (Defendant); Andrea Fedida (Defendant); Raphy Fedida (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Chae Chin Choe (Plaintiff); As to: Andrea Rothfedida (Defendant); Andrea Fedida (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Chae Chin Choe (Plaintiff); As to: Andrea Rothfedida (Defendant); Andrea Fedida (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less