This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2021 at 07:19:58 (UTC).

CFT NV DEVELOPMENTS LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS SAN JERSEY, LLC, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 CFT NV DEVELOPMENTS LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SAN JERSEY, LLC, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4834

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

CFT NV DEVELOPMENTS LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PATTI ANDREW S

SAN JERSEY LLC AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

HUBEN BRIAN DAVID

RUBIN STACY H

NIKDEL SUSAN

Defendant Attorneys

BAILEY WILLIAM R

DAVITT SEAN ALAN

CADDEN THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/28/2021: Request for Dismissal

Separate Statement - CFT NV DEVELOPMENTS, LLCS RESPONSES TO ANDREW S. PATTIS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO CFT NV DEVELOPMENTS, LLCS MOTIO

12/18/2020: Separate Statement - CFT NV DEVELOPMENTS, LLCS RESPONSES TO ANDREW S. PATTIS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO CFT NV DEVELOPMENTS, LLCS MOTIO

Objection - CFT NV DEVELOPMENTS, LLCS RESPONSES TO ANDREW S. PATTIS OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF DAVID LAI IN SUPPORT OF CFT NV DEVELOPMENTS, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/18/2020: Objection - CFT NV DEVELOPMENTS, LLCS RESPONSES TO ANDREW S. PATTIS OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF DAVID LAI IN SUPPORT OF CFT NV DEVELOPMENTS, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/18/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT, SAN JERSEY, LLCS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/9/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT, SAN JERSEY, LLCS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT, SAN JERSEY, LLCS OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF DAVID LAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/9/2020: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT, SAN JERSEY, LLCS OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF DAVID LAI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SONJAH L. PATTI IN SUPPORT OF SAN JERSEY, LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/9/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SONJAH L. PATTI IN SUPPORT OF SAN JERSEY, LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Separate Statement

10/9/2020: Separate Statement

Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Motion for Summary Judgment

10/9/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

4/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Case Management Statement

7/19/2019: Case Management Statement

Answer

6/18/2019: Answer

Cross-Complaint

6/20/2019: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

5/17/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/9/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Complaint); Filed by CFT NV Developments LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Cross-Complaint filed by San Jersey, LLC only); Filed by San Jersey, LLC, an Arizona limited liability company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by CFT NV Developments LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketMotion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Filed by CFT NV Developments LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by CFT NV Developments LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (ON PLAINTIFF, CFT NV DEVELOPMENTS LLC ?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED AGAINST DEFENDANTS, SAN JERSEY, LLC AND ANDREW S. PATTI); Filed by Andrew S Patti (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CFT NV Developments LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CFT NV Developments LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate (of Service); Filed by CFT NV Developments LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CFT NV Developments LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CFT NV Developments LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CFT NV Developments LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CFT NV Developments LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CFT NV Developments LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CFT NV DEVELOPMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NIKDEL SUSAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBIN STACY H.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUBEN BRIAN