This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2022 at 22:57:41 (UTC).

CESAR RUBEN HERNANDEZ VS ERNESTO STEVEN RUIZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 CESAR RUBEN HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ERNESTO STEVEN RUIZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EDWARD B. MORETON and WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1718

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EDWARD B. MORETON

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ CESAR RUBEN

Defendants

FOOD 4 LESS OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INC.

FOOD 4 LESS INC.

FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA INC.

WOLFF SUSAN

STERIK BOYLE HEIGHTS LLC

M704 KROGER WEST

FOOD 4 LESS

SCHNEIDER JANET

FOOD 4 LESS SUPERMARKETS INC.

STERIK BOYLE HEIGHTS L.P.

STERIK BOYLE HEIGHTS

FRANCO DIANA B.

RUIZ ERNESTO STEVEN

HUNTER SECURITY INC.

FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS INC.

THE KROGER CO.

FOOD 4 LESS GM INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASSANDRA GIORGIO JR.

Defendant Attorney

GERSH JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

2/10/2021: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JONATHAN A. TERMECHI, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF AN AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION

3/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JONATHAN A. TERMECHI, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF AN AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF S...)

4/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF S...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF S...)

4/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF S...)

Notice of Ruling

4/19/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Settlement

4/19/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

5/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT);)

8/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT);)

Request for Dismissal

9/20/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

2/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

7/22/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

7/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/16/2020

6/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/16/2020

Amended Complaint

7/22/2019: Amended Complaint

Answer

5/30/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/22/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

4/23/2019: Request for Dismissal

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cesar Ruben Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement);)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Cesar Ruben Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Cesar Ruben Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (of Summons and Complaint) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of S...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cesar Ruben Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cesar Ruben Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cesar Ruben Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cesar Ruben Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cesar Ruben Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cesar Ruben Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cesar Ruben Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HUNTER SECURITY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS SUPERMARKETS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where STERIK BOYLE HEIGHTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where M704 KROGER WEST is a litigant