This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 00:07:01 (UTC).

CESAR FERNANDEZ MEDINA VS MODA TRANSPORTATION LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 CESAR FERNANDEZ MEDINA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MODA TRANSPORTATION LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1319

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MEDINA CESAR FERNANDEZ

Defendants and Respondents

HO KEN

HO ALEXANDER

MODA TRANSPORTATION LLC

DOES 1 TO 250

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF CARLIN & BUCHSBAUM LLP

BUCHSBAUM BRENT STUART

CARLIN GARY RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/17/2018: Complaint

Summons

9/17/2018: Summons

Notice of Case Assignment

9/17/2018: Notice of Case Assignment

Initial Status Conference Report

10/5/2018: Initial Status Conference Report

Minute Order

9/24/2018: Minute Order

Other -

12/13/2018: Other -

Minute Order

12/18/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

12/20/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

3/8/2019: Minute Order

Status Conference Statement

3/1/2019: Status Conference Statement

Notice of Ruling

3/12/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

8/12/2019: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling at Initial Status Conference Hearing; Filed by Cesar Fernandez Medina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketStatus Conference Statement; Filed by Cesar Fernandez Medina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling at Initial Status Conference HEARING; Filed by Cesar Fernandez Medina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketOther - (Joint Response Statement); Filed by Cesar Fernandez Medina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Initial Status Conference; Filed by Cesar Fernandez Medina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 12; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cesar Fernandez Medina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less