This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/17/2022 at 11:41:41 (UTC).

CESAR ESQUEDA VS JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 CESAR ESQUEDA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0791

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESQUEDA CESAR

Defendants

BANDA JAVIAR

JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

ORQUIOLA NINO

Not Classified By Court

LAW OFFICES OF NATALIE MIRZAYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorney

MIRZAYAN NATALIE

Defendant Attorneys

PETRIDES THOMAS H.

PETRIDES THOMAS H

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO EXTEND RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE AND CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER

2/14/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO EXTEND RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE AND CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

4/4/2022: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

4/4/2022: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Lien - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S LIEN FOR FEES AND COSTS

4/4/2022: Notice of Lien - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S LIEN FOR FEES AND COSTS

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

4/8/2022: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEFENDANTS JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATIONS, NINO ORQUIOLAS, AND JAVIER BANDAS NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

4/11/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEFENDANTS JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATIONS, NINO ORQUIOLAS, AND JAVIER BANDAS NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/11/2022: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - DEFENDANTS JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, NINO ORQUIOLA AND JAVIER BANDAS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAIN

4/11/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - DEFENDANTS JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, NINO ORQUIOLA AND JAVIER BANDAS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAIN

Declaration - DECLARATION OF THOMAS H. PETRIDES REGARDING MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENTS PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 430.41 IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

4/11/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF THOMAS H. PETRIDES REGARDING MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENTS PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 430.41 IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/30/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/30/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/30/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/30/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/27/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • Hearing06/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Hearing06/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Hearing05/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Hearing05/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, NINO ORQUIOLA AND JAVIER BANDA?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; Filed by JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION (Defendant); NINO ORQUIOLA (Defendant); JAVIAR BANDA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDECLARATION OF THOMAS H. PETRIDES REGARDING MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENTS PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 430.41 IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; Filed by JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION (Defendant); NINO ORQUIOLA (Defendant); JAVIAR BANDA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION?S, NINO ORQUIOLA?S, AND JAVIER BANDA?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; Filed by JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION (Defendant); NINO ORQUIOLA (Defendant); JAVIAR BANDA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketJoint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference; Filed by JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION (Defendant); NINO ORQUIOLA (Defendant); JAVIAR BANDA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration (in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel); Filed by Law Offices of Natalie Mirzayan (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Attorney's Lien for Fees and Costs; Filed by Law Offices of Natalie Mirzayan (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Cesar Esqueda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Cesar Esqueda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cesar Esqueda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cesar Esqueda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cesar Esqueda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cesar Esqueda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIRZAYAN NATALIE