Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/11/2021 at 04:08:31 (UTC).

CESAR BLANCO, , ON BEHALF OF THREE STARS BUILDERS, INC. VS FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 CESAR BLANCO, , ON BEHALF OF THREE STARS BUILDERS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4151

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BLANCO CESAR ON BEHALF OF THREE STARS BUILDERS INC.

BLANCO ON BEHALF OF THREE STARS BUILDERS INC. CESAR

Defendants

CHAMPION DODGE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA CHAMPION CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE RAM FIAT

FCA US LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CHAMPION DODGE LLC. DBA CHAMPION CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE RAM FIAT

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MIKHOV STEVE B.

MORSE AMY

Defendant Attorney

PROUDFOOT MATTHEW M.

 

Court Documents

Answer

5/10/2021: Answer

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4/20/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

4/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Demand for Jury Trial

4/14/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/14/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • Hearing11/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Hearing10/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Cesar Blanco on behalf of Three Stars Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cesar Blanco on behalf of Three Stars Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Cesar Blanco on behalf of Three Stars Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cesar Blanco on behalf of Three Stars Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cesar Blanco on behalf of Three Stars Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cesar Blanco on behalf of Three Stars Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLANCO is a litigant

Latest cases where CHAMPION DODGE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA CHAMPION CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE RAM FIAT is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant