This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/20/2020 at 08:19:59 (UTC).

CERDAS, MARIA VS OCHOA, CESAR

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 CERDAS, MARIA filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against OCHOA, CESAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SANCHEZ, JAMES and SANTOS, M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2479

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SANCHEZ, JAMES

SANTOS, M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CERDAS MARIA

Respondent

OCHOA CESAR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • at 8:15 AM in Department 123, Santos, M., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 102, Sanchez, James, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.