This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2021 at 18:08:22 (UTC).

CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY, ET AL. VS TECHNICOLOR USA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against TECHNICOLOR USA, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1679

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY

ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY FKA CIGNA INSURANCE COMPANY FKA INA UNDERWRITERS FKA ALLIED INSURANCE COMPANY "ACE AMERICAN"

OAKWOOD INSURANCE COMPANY

PACIFIC EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY

PACIFIC INDEMNITY COMPANY

Defendants

TECHNICOLOR USA INC.

AETNA CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY

ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISK INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN GUARANTEE & LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE COMPANY

AXA INSURANCE COMPANY

CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY

EMPLOYERS SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY

FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ILLINOIS

XL INSURANCE AMERICA INC

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIWASIAN DEBORAH ANN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/26/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Century Indemnity Company (Plaintiff); ACE American Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Pacific Employers Insurance Company (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Century Indemnity Company (Plaintiff); ACE American Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Pacific Employers Insurance Company (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Century Indemnity Company (Plaintiff); ACE American Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Pacific Employers Insurance Company (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMPLOYERS SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ILLINOI is a litigant

Latest cases where AXA Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc. is a litigant